+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Rick)
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15