+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
- General Order
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Loring
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 12, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor