+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4
- SA's read, adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Enacting clause restored
- General Order, Amended
- Senate Rule suspended
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Dahm
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7
- General Order
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Brumbaugh
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
February 6, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8