+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- JCR adopted
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- General Order
- JCR adopted
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
May 17, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor