+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sanders
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15