+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Newell
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2