+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/18/2021
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 5
- SA's read, adopted
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wallace
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 29
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 10, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor