+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6
- SA's read, adopted
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5
- Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell, Derby
- General Order
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Sanders, West (Tammy), Russ, Blancett, Bush, Frix
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Downing
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
February 28, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor