+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
- General Order
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walke
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor