+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25
- General Order
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Downing
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor