+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 26
- Referred for engrossment
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Kirby
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor