+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Measure returned to House
- Veto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- To Senate
- Veto overridden: Ayes: 92 Nays: 6
- Vetoed 05/18/2020
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- JCR adopted
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 4
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Rader
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2020: Senate Veto Override
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 12, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
May 6, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor