+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ford
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
February 28, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor