+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 29; Ayes: 68 Nays: 26
- SA's read, adopted
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
- Emergency added
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bell
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21
- General Order
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pittman
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 5, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 7
May 5, 2021: House Emergency
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 7
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 11
February 11, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10