+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 6
- SA's read, adopted
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Matthews, Hoskin
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 13
- General Order
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Government Modernization Committee
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walker
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8