+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Enacting clause restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Denney
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor