+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hicks
- Coauthored by Senator Rosino
- Coauthored by Senator Kidd
- Coauthored by Senator Daniels
- Coauthored by Senator Simpson
- Coauthored by Senator Young
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Smalley
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Sneed, Perryman, Hill, Humphrey, Lawson
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Roberts (Dustin), Blancett
- CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
- Withdrawn from Insurance Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Munson, Echols, Bush, Fetgatter, Frix, Wallace, Kannady, Dunnington, Dollens, McEntire, Mize, Bennett, Caldwell (Trey)
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor