+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Thompson, Newberry, David, Jech, Silk, Floyd, Matthews
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Marlatt
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce and Real Estate
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osborn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
February 17, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor