+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- General Order
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 10
February 20, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor