+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
- Coauthored by Representative Gann
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor