+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 6
- Motion to reconsider tabled
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Ritze
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- CCR adopted
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Boggs
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Enns
- CCR submitted
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Barrington, Dahm, Boggs, Ellis, Ivester
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Allen
- General Order, Considered
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8
- Amended
- Referred for engrossment
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety Committee
- Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Martin (Steve)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
February 19, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor