+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Conley
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Munson, Lawson, Hasenbeck
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 80
- Absent: 21
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
February 6, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15