+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 02/27/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
- Coauthored by Senator Treat
- Coauthored by Senator Silk
- General Order, Considered
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Allen
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Scott
- Remove as coauthor Senator Hall
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
- Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 30
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Tadlock, Russ, Frix, Lawson, Sims, McCall, O'Donnell, Taylor, Pfeiffer, Sneed
- General Order
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Humphrey, McBride, Hasenbeck, Patzkowsky, Cornwell, Hilbert
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols, Mize, CrosswhiteHader, Townley, McDugle, Roberts (Sean), Olsen, Gann, West (Kevin), Steagall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2019: House Table
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 25
February 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2019: House Table Amendment
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 19
February 13, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 90
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2019: House Table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 18
February 7, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor