+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health Committee
- Withdrawn from Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walker
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Vote
February 18, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor