+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson, Russ, Cooksey
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Human Services
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ownbey, Nelson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 18, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9