+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
- Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Reynolds
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor