+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- To Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Stanislawski, Brecheen, Boggs, Standridge, Wyrick, Bass
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Enacting clause stricken
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2016: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
April 14, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
February 16, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor