+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin), Steagall
- General Order
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 27, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10