+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 19
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13
- General Order
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Floyd
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8