+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Phillips
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor