+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/09/2014
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Jolley, Brinkley
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
- First Reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9
- General Order
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sears
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
February 10, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1