+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sears
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
February 10, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor