+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2
- SA's read, adopted
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
- General Order
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Billy
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 19, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12