+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 03/13/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
- Coauthored by Representative Wright
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Ford
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Osburn, Frix, Fetgatter, West (Tammy), Olsen, Vancuren, McEntire, Kiger, CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Manger, Steagall, Smith, Burns, Strom, Davis, Hasenbeck, Cornwell, Sterling, Dills, Moore, Miller, Marti, Fincher, Pae, May, McBride, Bush, West (Kevin), Talley, Sims, Stark, Conley, Lepak, Taylor, Grego, Hardin (David), Boatman, Patzkowsky, Luttrell, Gann, Echols, Kerbs, Hill, McDugle, Johns, Kannady, Wallace, Baker, Roberts (Sean), Townley
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Boles, Mize
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Authored by Representative McCall
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor