+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 03/13/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ford
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Wright
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, West (Josh), Osburn, Frix, West (Tammy), Fetgatter, Olsen, Manger, McEntire, Kiger, Phillips, CrosswhiteHader, Steagall, Smith, Strom, Davis, Hasenbeck, Dills, Cornwell, Sterling, Moore, Fincher, Marti, Miller, Pae, May, McBride, Burns, West (Kevin), Bush, Talley, Sims, Lepak, Stark, Conley, Vancuren, Grego, Hardin (David), Patzkowsky, Boatman, Luttrell, Gann, Kerbs, Echols, Hill, Caldwell (Trey), McDugle, Johns, Kannady, Wallace, Hilbert, Baker, Roberts (Sean)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Mize
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor