+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2016
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brooks
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
- Enacting clause stricken
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 27
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
- General Order
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Peterson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1