+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
- CCR adopted
- Remove as coauthor Senator Standridge
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- To Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Howard, Daniels, Leewright, Sharp, Boren, Brooks
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Judiciary and naming Conference Committee on Rules
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Emergency added
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Standridge
- Coauthored by Senator Brooks
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 29
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunnington
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
May 15, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 11
April 23, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor