+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ranson, Bush, Pae, Blancett, Ortega, Sims
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunnington, Moore
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor