+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14
- SA's read, adopted
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Luttrell
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ranson, Bush, Pae, Blancett, Ortega, Moore
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunnington
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 8
April 17, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor