+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5
- SA's read, adopted
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
- Amended by floor substitute
- Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Russ
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 11
March 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8