+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17