+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
- Remove Representative Steagall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kendrix
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steagall
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
March 10, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor