+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Smalley
- Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Hicks
- Remove as coauthor Senator Hicks
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Boatman
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Bell, Brewer, Bush, Roe, Talley, Albright
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Branham
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 79
- Absent: 22
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor