+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
- General Order
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Glenn
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 20, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor