+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 16
- General Order, Considered
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 23
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Davis
- General Order
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McDugle
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor