+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
- Coauthored by Senator Jett
- Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Frix
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor