+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider vote failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 18
- Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 22
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Coauthored by Senator Silk
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Dahm
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Bennett (John), Calvey, Gann, Roberts (Sean)
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 10
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Coody
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2017: Senate Reconsider
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 7
March 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 13
February 14, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor