+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Retirement and Insurance
- Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Silk
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McBride
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hill
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hicks
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mize
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Boggs
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
- Coauthored by Representative Moore
- Coauthored by Weaver
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 3
- Amended
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Rosino, Pederson, Dugger, Hall, Scott, Stanley, Kidd
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Kerbs, Branham, Kannady, May, Dunnington, Munson, Conley, Meredith, Rosecrants, Dollens, Perryman, Loring, Ranson, West (Tammy), Fetgatter, Baker, Fugate, Humphrey, Sneed, Pae, Tadlock, Nollan, Manger, Albright, Lawson, Goodwin
- General Order
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Frix
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor