+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Tadlock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
February 18, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor