+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5
- CCR adopted
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
- CCR adopted
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- CCR submitted
- Title restored
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Frix
- Coauthored by Representative Frix
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCs changed Brooks, Matthews, Paxton, Quinn, Stanley, Taylor to Paxton, Quinn, Montgomery, Hamilton, Jett, Newhouse, Taylor, Thompson, Daniels, Rader, Boren, Floyd, Stanley
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Quinn, Taylor, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
- Referred for engrossment
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on General Order
- Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
- Referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
- Withdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 38; Ayes: 51 Nays: 38
- General Order
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6
March 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 12
February 22, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2